OK SB1118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Government Efficiency, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Government Efficiency, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capitol buildings; providing for display of national motto in the visitor center area of the State Capitol building. Effective date.
Title
Capitol buildings; providing for display of national motto in the visitor center area of the State Capitol building. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Government Efficiency, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2020-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |