OK SB1141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Post-Military Service Occupation, Education and Credentialing Act; providing violation. Effective date.
Title
Post-Military Service Occupation, Education and Credentialing Act; providing violation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John), Roberts (Dustin) |
2018-04-17 | House | General Order |
2018-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dossett |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 4100 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4100 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |