OK SB12 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB12
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Campus security; modifying entities that can create a campus police force; inclusions. Effective date.
Title
Campus security; modifying entities that can create a campus police force; inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 22 |
2017-04-17 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bennett (John) (principal House author) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB12 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 360 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 360 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |