OK SB120 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB120
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; extending time period during which certain tax credits for aerospace industry may be claimed. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; extending time period during which certain tax credits for aerospace industry may be claimed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 18 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn (Leslie) |
2017-04-11 | House | Remove Representative Osborn (Leslie) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB120 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2357 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 304 | New Code | See Bill Text |