OK SB1218 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Corrections; modifying institutions included within definition. Effective date.
Title
Department of Corrections; modifying institutions included within definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2016 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 5 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-13 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-12 | House | Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-04-12 | House | General Order |
2016-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Utilities Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2016-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |