OK SB1271 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; modifying certain accounting requirements.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; modifying certain accounting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Motion expired |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Fields |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 17 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Watson (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |