OK SB1307 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; providing exemption from certain assessments for students over certain age who seek to complete twelfth grade. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; providing exemption from certain assessments for students over certain age who seek to complete twelfth grade. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2024-04-22 | House | General Order |
2024-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2024-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |