OK SB1312 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Bennett (Forrest) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Bennett (Forrest) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; repealing sections relating to the Oklahoma Cosmetology and Barbering Act. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; repealing sections relating to the Oklahoma Cosmetology and Barbering Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bennett (Forrest) (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 199 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 13 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 14 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 15 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 8 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 9 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |