OK SB1336 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - SCs named Crain, Standridge, Justice, David, Griffin, Bass, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - SCs named Crain, Standridge, Justice, David, Griffin, Bass, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; permitting hospital trusts; taxation; requiring certain use of revenues. Effective date.
Title
Public health; permitting hospital trusts; taxation; requiring certain use of revenues. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 50 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | SCs named Crain, Standridge, Justice, David, Griffin, Bass, Sparks |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2016-04-27 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-13 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 41 |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 58 Nays: 24 |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 35 |
2016-04-12 | House | Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2016-04-12 | House | General Order |
2016-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2016-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Murdock (principal House author) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by Barrington |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |