OK SB1354 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Hospital Residency Training Program Act; modifying preference for certain medical school graduates. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Hospital Residency Training Program Act; modifying preference for certain medical school graduates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ervin Yen [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-19 | House | Motion expired |
2018-04-17 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 19 |
2018-04-17 | House | General Order |
2018-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Derby (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |