OK SB138 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; driver license flag emblem. Codification. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; driver license flag emblem. Codification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | HAs read | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Vaughan, Scott, Roan, Ritze, Walker, Condit, Kirby | |
2011-04-27 | General Order | |
2011-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | coauthored by Stanislawski, Bass | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Shoemake (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Garrison, Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ballenger | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |