OK SB1446 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Agriculture; removing certain license application requirements. Effective date.
Title
Department of Agriculture; removing certain license application requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2016 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 2 |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-03-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Wright (principal House author) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 10 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 20 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 20 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 8 | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text |