OK SB1471 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Collection of child support; requiring Tax Commission to provide certain information to DHS. Effective date.
Title
Collection of child support; requiring Tax Commission to provide certain information to DHS. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DHS DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DHS DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-08 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-09 | HAs read | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16 | |
2012-04-05 | General Order | |
2012-04-03 | Title restored | |
2012-04-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Finance | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Finance Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 205 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 205 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |