OK SB1474 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; creating privilege for insurance compliance self-evaluative audit. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating privilege for insurance compliance self-evaluative audit. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Fred Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 10 | |
2012-05-08 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Amended | |
2012-04-26 | House Rule suspended | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 14 | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 14 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |