OK SB1490 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highway designations; designating the Robert B. Robison Memorial Highway. Effective date.
Title
Memorial highway designations; designating the Robert B. Robison Memorial Highway. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | General Order |
2018-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 269 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |