OK SB1535 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Department of Education; making an appropriation. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State Department of Education; making an appropriation. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | House and Joint Rules suspended | |
2012-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | coauthored by Halligan, Ford, Mazzei, Stanislawski, Newberry, Marlatt, Crain, Fields, Sykes | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-25 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-05-25 | Title restored | |
2012-05-25 | CCR read | |
2012-05-25 | SCs named Jolley, Ford, Justice, Halligan, Burrage, Paddack | |
2012-05-25 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named GCCA | |
2012-05-02 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-25 | HAs read | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 31; Ayes: 39 Nays: 30 | |
2012-04-24 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-20 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2012-02-20 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-20 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |