OK SB1551 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State health insurance; modifying flexible benefit allowance; modifying election of benefit plans. Effective date.
Title
State health insurance; modifying flexible benefit allowance; modifying election of benefit plans. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency added |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |