OK SB1573 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Bail bondsmen; clarifying language. Effective date.
Title
Bail bondsmen; clarifying language. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pemberton |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |