OK SB1574 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Records Act; modifying definition. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Open Records Act; modifying definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-25 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 1 |
2024-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope |
2024-04-25 | House | General Order |
2024-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |