OK SB1653 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; adding science, technology, engineering and math block course to certain list of courses; adding grade level for certain courses taken at a technology center school. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; adding science, technology, engineering and math block course to certain list of courses; adding grade level for certain courses taken at a technology center school. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-31 | House | General Order |
2014-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Halligan |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 11 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 541 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 545 | New Code | See Bill Text |