OK SB1686 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Discovery; establishing procedures for discovery master. Effective date.
Title
Discovery; establishing procedures for discovery master. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |