OK SB1741 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Campaign finance; relating to corporate contributions; modifying definitions; deleting prohibition on corporate expenditures. Emergency.
Title
Campaign finance; relating to corporate contributions; modifying definitions; deleting prohibition on corporate expenditures. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 21 | |
2010-03-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1741&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb1741_int.rtf |