OK SB1763 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Service agreements; enacting the Prohibition of Unfair Service Agreements Act. Effective date.
Title
Service agreements; enacting the Prohibition of Unfair Service Agreements Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bashore (principal House author) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |