OK SB1798 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; authorizing the Commissioner of Public Safety to provide certain rules on collisions on private property. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; authorizing the Commissioner of Public Safety to provide certain rules on collisions on private property. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-01 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-09 | HAs read | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 8 | |
2012-04-05 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Peterson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |