OK SB1814 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Employment discrimination; adding definition. Effective date.
Title
Employment discrimination; adding definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Approved by Governor 04/09/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-06 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 12 | |
2010-04-05 | General Order | |
2010-03-24 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |