OK SB1814 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Military service; creating the Oklahoma Blue Heart Medal. Effective date.
Title
Military service; creating the Oklahoma Blue Heart Medal. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] |
Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Mark McCullough [R] |
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] | Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Approved by Governor 05/16/2012 | |
2012-05-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-14 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-14 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-10 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-05-10 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-10 | HAs read | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), McCullough, Walker, Roan | |
2012-04-09 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wesselhoft, Bennett | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Allen, Brown, David, Garrison, Treat | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-02-06 | coauthored by Brinkley | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |