OK SB1824 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Victims' Rights Act; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Victims' Rights Act; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Brooks |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-22 | House | Amended |
2014-04-22 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 142A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 142A | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 142A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |