OK SB1876 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; specifying curricular components for physical education. Effective date.
Title
Schools; specifying curricular components for physical education. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House: R (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House: R (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 7 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-17 | Title restored | |
2010-05-17 | CCR read | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Hickman, Peterson, Cox, Cannaday, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Coates, Halligan, Ford, Paddack, Johnson (Mike), Jolley, Sykes | |
2010-04-29 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 11 | |
2010-04-22 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-22 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-22 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-04-22 | General Order | |
2010-03-25 | Title restored | |
2010-03-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shumate | |
2010-03-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Hickman (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Education committee | |
2010-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hickman | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |