OK SB1897 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled dangerous substances; requiring registration of pain management clinics; stating requirements for clinics; providing penalties. Effective date.
Title
Controlled dangerous substances; requiring registration of pain management clinics; stating requirements for clinics; providing penalties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |