OK SB1914 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water and water rights; requiring all permit holders within petitioned area to participate in groundwater irrigation district. Effective date.
Title
Water and water rights; requiring all permit holders within petitioned area to participate in groundwater irrigation district. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 35 |
2024-04-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2024-04-18 | House | General Order |
2024-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |