OK SB1918 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance claims; prohibiting health benefit plans from disallowing direct payment for covered services. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance claims; prohibiting health benefit plans from disallowing direct payment for covered services. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |