OK SB1955 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; authorizing cause of action for certain violations; establishing procedural requirements; authorizing certain discovery. Emergency.
Title
Patient's Right to Pharmacy Choice Act; authorizing cause of action for certain violations; establishing procedural requirements; authorizing certain discovery. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (principal House author) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |