OK SB1960 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Appropriations; creating budget limit for Corporation Commission. Effective Date.
Title
Appropriations; creating budget limit for Corporation Commission. Effective Date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-24 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2012-05-24 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6 | |
2012-05-24 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-24 | General Order | |
2012-05-23 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | |
2012-05-22 | First Reading | |
2012-05-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-22 | Motion expired | |
2012-05-22 | Notice served to reconsider vote on emergency Jolley | |
2012-05-22 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 | |
2012-05-22 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-21 | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | |
2012-05-09 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-05-03 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) | |
2012-05-03 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2012-05-03 | coauthored by Justice | |
2012-05-03 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-05-03 | First Reading |