OK SB197 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Dunlap (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Dunlap (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Individual's right of conscience; creating the Oklahoma Right of Conscience Act; stating protected actions. Effective date.
Title
Individual's right of conscience; creating the Oklahoma Right of Conscience Act; stating protected actions. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dunlap (principal House author) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Silk |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB197 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Dunlap (principal House author)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 1850 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1850 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1850 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1850 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |