OK SB2008 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Vetoed 04/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Vetoed 04/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Initiative and referendum; providing alternative procedure for submission of ballot titles to Attorney General. Effective date.
Title
Initiative and referendum; providing alternative procedure for submission of ballot titles to Attorney General. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] |
Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Vetoed 04/26/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Veto message read | |
2010-04-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11 | |
2010-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Osborn | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 | |
2010-03-08 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-11 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |