OK SB2028 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Failed in Committee - Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Failed in Committee - Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; including certain game animals as an agricultural product for purpose of a sales tax exemption. Effective date.
Title
Sales tax exemption; including certain game animals as an agricultural product for purpose of a sales tax exemption. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Finance |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |