OK SB2132 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporation Commission; creating the Oklahoma Wind Energy Development Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Corporation Commission; creating the Oklahoma Wind Energy Development Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Sanders, Thompson, Watson, Morgan, Rousselot, Martin (Steve) | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-05-04 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-19 | HAs read | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 | |
2010-04-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2010-04-15 | General Order | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2010-03-01 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-10 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 160 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |