OK SB2179 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Outdoor advertising; modifying regulation of certain signs visible from highways. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Outdoor advertising; modifying regulation of certain signs visible from highways. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read | |
2010-04-27 | Conference granted, HC's named Thompson, Shannon, Liebmann, Watson, Rousselot, Shoemake, Jackson | |
2010-04-19 | SCs named Branan, Bingman, Brogdon, Marlatt, Burrage | |
2010-04-14 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-06 | HAs read | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | General Order | |
2010-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2010-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Thompson (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-12 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Thompson | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Branan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1271 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 1272 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 1275 | New Code | See Bill Text |