OK SB2180 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; creating the Roofing Contractor Registration Act. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; creating the Roofing Contractor Registration Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Fred Jordan [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 | |
2010-05-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Shelton, Sherrer | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-27 | Title restored | |
2010-05-27 | CCR read | |
2010-05-26 | Conference granted, HC's named Jordan, Sullivan, McDaniel (Randy), McNiel, Carey, Shumate | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named Newberry, Coates, Brogdon, Johnson (Mike), Burrage | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-19 | HAs read | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 12 | |
2010-04-15 | General Order | |
2010-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-10 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Remove as author Senator Coates; authored by Senator Newberry | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Jordan | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-16 | Pending removal author Senator Coates and replace with Senator Newberry | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1151 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |