OK SB2203 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Probate procedure; providing for termination of durable power of attorney under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Probate procedure; providing for termination of durable power of attorney under certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | CCR read | |
2010-05-04 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, Duncan, Jordan, Trebilcock, McCullough, Inman, Morrissette, Buck | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named Crain, Anderson, Sykes, Newberry, Laster | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-13 | HAs read | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-12 | General Order | |
2010-03-30 | Title restored | |
2010-03-30 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |