OK SB2258 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; creating the Greater Protecting Victims of Human Trafficking Act of 2010. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; creating the Greater Protecting Victims of Human Trafficking Act of 2010. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Randy Terrill [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kirby, Tibbs, Christian | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-26 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-26 | Title restored | |
2010-05-26 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, HC's named Terrill, Duncan, McCullough, Christian, Proctor, Hamilton | |
2010-04-26 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-21 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Kern | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Gumm | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill | |
2010-02-18 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Gumm | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1488 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 446 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 748 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |