OK SB2303 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; adding duties to Council on Law enforcement Education and Training. Effective date.
Title
Schools; adding duties to Council on Law enforcement Education and Training. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-26 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-26 | Title restored | |
2010-05-26 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Terrill, Christian, McCullough, Tibbs, Smithson, Thomsen, Roan, Hoskin, Lamons | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Roan | |
2010-04-21 | HAs read | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-25 | coauthored by Paddack | |
2010-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |