OK SB24 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB24
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Driver licenses; motor vehicle report charges. Effective date.
Title
Driver licenses; motor vehicle report charges. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 13 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 13 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 32 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Allen |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 13 Nays: 29 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB24 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017