OK SB243 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring certain financial report to be presented monthly to district boards of education. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring certain financial report to be presented monthly to district boards of education. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Strohm (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB243 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education