OK SB267 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB267
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Veto override message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Veto override message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; increasing membership of the Advancement of Wellness Advisory Council; broadening jurisdictional areas. Effective date.
Title
Public health; increasing membership of the Advancement of Wellness Advisory Council; broadening jurisdictional areas. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ally Seifried [R] | Rep. Jeff Boatman [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] |
Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: VETO OVERRIDE NO EMERGENCY (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Public Health Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Public Health Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Veto override message received |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Vetoed 04/26/2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7 |
2023-04-19 | House | General Order |
2023-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2023-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2023-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fugate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Seifried |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB267 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Veto override message received