OK SB280 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying dates for application and notification of student transfers. Effective date.
Title
Schools; modifying dates for application and notification of student transfers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2013 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Hickman |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Casey (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |