OK SB287 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Candidacy for office; requiring certain criminal history information on declaration of candidacy. Effective date.
Title
Candidacy for office; requiring certain criminal history information on declaration of candidacy. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 2 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 2 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 58 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-14 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-06 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-01 | Senate | SCs named Paddack, Griffin, Johnson (Rob), Marlatt, Burrage, Treat |
2013-04-30 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2013-04-25 | House | General Order |
2013-04-10 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Floyd (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paddack |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |