OK SB325 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB325
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Jason)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Jason)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal prosecutions; modifying time limits for conducting certain criminal proceedings; time limitation for setting trial date; grounds for delay. Effective date.
Title
Criminal prosecutions; modifying time limits for conducting certain criminal proceedings; time limitation for setting trial date; grounds for delay. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Collin Duel [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Jason Lowe [D] |
Rep. Jared Deck [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Jason) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck, Lepak |
2024-04-24 | House | General Order |
2024-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Duel (principal House author) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB325 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary