OK SB335 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB335
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; construing wages; creating system for ex-military claimants; expanding time for objections and hearing. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; construing wages; creating system for ex-military claimants; expanding time for objections and hearing. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB335 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019