OK SB337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Vetoed 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Vetoed 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use tax; requiring certain sales report from internet vendors to tax commission; providing penalty. Effective date.
Title
Use tax; requiring certain sales report from internet vendors to tax commission; providing penalty. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Rep. Greg Babinec [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Vetoed 04/25/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 17 |
2018-04-18 | House | General Order |
2018-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Babinec (principal House author) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Holt |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Dugger |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB337 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance